THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:59:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: Kheyson, Alex (Used Until: 19 May 2021)
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8 Richmond Park Dr
Lennox & Addington County General Hospital
Anesthesiology
Napanee ON K7R 2Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: West Parry Sound Health Centre
LOCATION: Parry Sound

HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SASHA KHEYSON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jan 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kheyson (CPSO#: 130455 )
Business Address: 8 Richmond Park Dr
Napanee ON K7R 2Z4

General Information

Former Name: Kheyson, Alex (Used Until: 19 May 2021)
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8 Richmond Park Dr
Lennox & Addington County General Hospital
Anesthesiology
Napanee ON K7R 2Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: West Parry Sound Health Centre
LOCATION: Parry Sound

HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SASHA KHEYSON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jan 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kheyson (CPSO#: 130455 )
Business Address: 8 Richmond Park Dr
Napanee ON K7R 2Z4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SASHA KHEYSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHEYSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SASHA KHEYSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHEYSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021