THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:13:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: ABIA STATE UNIVERSITY, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 104A-705 Grandview St N
Oshawa ON L1K 0V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 115 Simcoe Street South
Oshawa Ontario L1H 4G7
Phone: 9052151815
Fax: 9052152145

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Mar 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 17 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Leo Ogba Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Ogba (CPSO#: 130626 )
Business Address: 104A-705 Grandview St N
Oshawa ON L1K 0V4
9057251000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: ABIA STATE UNIVERSITY, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 104A-705 Grandview St N
Oshawa ON L1K 0V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 115 Simcoe Street South
Oshawa Ontario L1H 4G7
Phone: 9052151815
Fax: 9052152145

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Mar 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 17 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Leo Ogba Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Ogba (CPSO#: 130626 )
Business Address: 104A-705 Grandview St N
Oshawa ON L1K 0V4
9057251000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LEO EZEKWE OGBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OGBA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LEO EZEKWE OGBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OGBA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: ABIA STATE UNIVERSITY, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2021