THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 05:02:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Perugia, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Main St W
McMaster Children's Hospital-Hamilton Health Sciences
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 325 Wellington St N
Ron Joyce Children's Health Center
Hamilton ON L8L 0A4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 12 Oct 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 12 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Italy

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ELISABETTA TRINARI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Trinari (CPSO#: 130651 )
Business Address: 325 Wellington St N
Ron Joyce Children's Health Center
Hamilton Ontario L8L 0A4
905 521 1200
Business Address: 1200 Main St W
McMaster Children's Hospital
Hamilton Health Sciences
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
905 521 1200

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Perugia, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Main St W
McMaster Children's Hospital-Hamilton Health Sciences
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 325 Wellington St N
Ron Joyce Children's Health Center
Hamilton ON L8L 0A4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 12 Oct 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 12 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Italy

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ELISABETTA TRINARI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Trinari (CPSO#: 130651 )
Business Address: 325 Wellington St N
Ron Joyce Children's Health Center
Hamilton Ontario L8L 0A4
905 521 1200
Business Address: 1200 Main St W
McMaster Children's Hospital
Hamilton Health Sciences
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
905 521 1200

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
18 Mar 2024
30 Jun 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 18 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2025
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. ELISABETTA TRINARI may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Pediatrics, Division of Developmental Pediatrics, McMaster University, in which Dr. TRINARI holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. TRINARI no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. TRINARI’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. TRINARI’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 12 October, 2021, and expires on 30 June, 2028. Upon renewal of Dr. TRINARI's academic appointment at McMaster University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. ELISABETTA TRINARI may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Pediatrics, Division of Developmental Pediatrics, McMaster University, in which Dr. TRINARI holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. TRINARI no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. TRINARI’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. TRINARI’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 12 October, 2021, and expires on 30 June, 2028. Upon renewal of Dr. TRINARI's academic appointment at McMaster University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Perugia, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2028
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 Sep 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2021
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2028

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 Sep 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Oct 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Oct 2021