THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:17:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: Penner, Jonathan Chea (Used Until: 16 Apr 2021)
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 - 418 Eglinton Avenue West
Magenta Health -Midtown
Toronto Ontario M5N 1A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-479-8410
Fax: 416 342 1754

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jul 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 22 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gamble Penner-Chea Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gamble (CPSO#: 130669 ) Dr. J. Penner-Chea (CPSO#: 130670 )
Business Address: 200 - 418 Eglinton Avenue West
Magenta Health -Midtown
Toronto Ontario M5N 1A2
647-479-8410

General Information

Former Name: Penner, Jonathan Chea (Used Until: 16 Apr 2021)
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 - 418 Eglinton Avenue West
Magenta Health -Midtown
Toronto Ontario M5N 1A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-479-8410
Fax: 416 342 1754

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jul 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 22 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gamble Penner-Chea Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gamble (CPSO#: 130669 ) Dr. J. Penner-Chea (CPSO#: 130670 )
Business Address: 200 - 418 Eglinton Avenue West
Magenta Health -Midtown
Toronto Ontario M5N 1A2
647-479-8410

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN PENNER-CHEA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PENNER-CHEA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN PENNER-CHEA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PENNER-CHEA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2021
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jun 2021