THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:52:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: MCI The Doctor's Office - Mississauga West
15-2575 Dundas St W
Mississauga ON L5K 2M6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Aug 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 04 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR.LAITH DHAFIR JASIM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Apr 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Jasim (CPSO#: 130756 )
Business Address: 2575 Dundas St W
Mississauga ON L5K 2M6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: MCI The Doctor's Office - Mississauga West
15-2575 Dundas St W
Mississauga ON L5K 2M6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Aug 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 04 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR.LAITH DHAFIR JASIM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Apr 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Jasim (CPSO#: 130756 )
Business Address: 2575 Dundas St W
Mississauga ON L5K 2M6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAITH DHAFIR JASIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JASIM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAITH DHAFIR JASIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JASIM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Nov 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 27 Jul 2025