THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:12:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3-88 Maplewood Ave
St Peter's Hospital
Hamilton ON L8M 1W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 777-3837
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 60 Woodlawn Rd E
The Village of Riverside Glen
Guelph ON N1H 8M8
Phone: (519) 822-5272
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hamilton Health Sciences - St. Peter's Hospital
88 Maplewood Ave
Hamilton ON L8M 1W9
Phone: (905) 777-3837
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1Y3
Phone: 905-522-1155
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1030 Sheppard Ave W
North York ON M3H 6C1
Phone: 4166367377
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: BASSILY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Bassily (CPSO#: 130841 )
Business Address: 3-88 Maplewood Avenue
St. Peter's Hospital
Hamilton Ontario L8M 1W4
(905) 777-3837

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3-88 Maplewood Ave
St Peter's Hospital
Hamilton ON L8M 1W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 777-3837
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 60 Woodlawn Rd E
The Village of Riverside Glen
Guelph ON N1H 8M8
Phone: (519) 822-5272
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hamilton Health Sciences - St. Peter's Hospital
88 Maplewood Ave
Hamilton ON L8M 1W9
Phone: (905) 777-3837
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1Y3
Phone: 905-522-1155
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1030 Sheppard Ave W
North York ON M3H 6C1
Phone: 4166367377
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: BASSILY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Bassily (CPSO#: 130841 )
Business Address: 3-88 Maplewood Avenue
St. Peter's Hospital
Hamilton Ontario L8M 1W4
(905) 777-3837

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIROLOS NABIL SHAWKY BASSILY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASSILY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIROLOS NABIL SHAWKY BASSILY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASSILY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 07 Aug 2026

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021