THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:49:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Edinburgh, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Rolling Hills Dr
5th Avenue Walk-in Clinic and Family Practice
Unit 5
Orangeville ON L9W 6T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 942-0040
Fax: (519) 942-0048

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. SUKHMONI K. DHALIWAL MEDICAL PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dhaliwal (CPSO#: 130884 )
Business Address: 5-50 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 6T6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Edinburgh, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Rolling Hills Dr
5th Avenue Walk-in Clinic and Family Practice
Unit 5
Orangeville ON L9W 6T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 942-0040
Fax: (519) 942-0048

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. SUKHMONI K. DHALIWAL MEDICAL PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dhaliwal (CPSO#: 130884 )
Business Address: 5-50 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 6T6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUKHMONI KAUR DHALIWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHALIWAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUKHMONI KAUR DHALIWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHALIWAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Edinburgh, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021