THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:36:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Lagos, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 360 Bayly Street West
Baywest Medical
unit 4 & 5
Ajax Ontario L1S 1P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-612-1234
Fax: 289-372-0202

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Apr 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 29 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. OLANIYAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Olaniyan (CPSO#: 131019 )
Business Address: 360 Bayly Street West
Ajax Ontario L1S 1P1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Lagos, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 360 Bayly Street West
Baywest Medical
unit 4 & 5
Ajax Ontario L1S 1P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-612-1234
Fax: 289-372-0202

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Apr 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 29 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. OLANIYAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Olaniyan (CPSO#: 131019 )
Business Address: 360 Bayly Street West
Ajax Ontario L1S 1P1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OLUWABUKOLA RITA OLANIYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLANIYAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OLUWABUKOLA RITA OLANIYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLANIYAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Lagos, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021