THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 03:41:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv University, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167566000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 08 Feb 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 08 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JESSICA ROTMAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rotman (CPSO#: 131116 )
Business Address: 4001 Leslie Street
North York General Hospital
Radiology
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167566000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 08 Feb 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 08 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JESSICA ROTMAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rotman (CPSO#: 131116 )
Business Address: 4001 Leslie Street
North York General Hospital
Radiology
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
05 May 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 05 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. JESSICA ASHLEY ROTMAN may practise medicine independently in diagnostic radiology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. JESSICA ASHLEY ROTMAN may practise medicine independently in diagnostic radiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 05 May 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 05 May 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Feb 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 08 Feb 2022