THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 04:39:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2021
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 Ross Ave E
Timmins and District Hospital
Timmins ON P4N 8P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 935 Ramsey Lake Rd
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
Sudbury ON P3E 2C6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Blanche River Health Englehart
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Blanche River Health
LOCATION: Englehart

HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. R. PREVOST MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Prevost (CPSO#: 131177 )
Business Address: 700 Ross Ave E
Timmins ON P4N 8P2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 Ross Ave E
Timmins and District Hospital
Timmins ON P4N 8P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 935 Ramsey Lake Rd
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
Sudbury ON P3E 2C6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Blanche River Health Englehart
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Blanche River Health
LOCATION: Englehart

HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. R. PREVOST MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Prevost (CPSO#: 131177 )
Business Address: 700 Ross Ave E
Timmins ON P4N 8P2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHAD RODOLPHE PREVOST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PREVOST is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHAD RODOLPHE PREVOST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PREVOST is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021