THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:55:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2021
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 750 Great Northern Rd
Sault Area Hospital
Hospitalist Program
3rd Floor
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-759-3434
Extension: 5352
Fax: 705-759-3731
Address: 650 Northern Avenue East
Extendicare Maple View
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 6G3
Phone: 705-574-3000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 443 Northern Avenue East
Algoma Nurse Practitioner-Led Clinic
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 4J3
Phone: 705-942-4717
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 240 McNabb St
Group Health Centre
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 1Y5
Phone: 705-759-1234
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 658 Second Line West
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6C 2K9
Phone: 7054505339
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 750 Great Northern Road
Sault Area Hospital
Emergency Department
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Phone: 705-207-9196
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jordan D.S. Law Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jul 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Law (CPSO#: 131188 )
Business Address: 750 Great Northern Rd
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 0A8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 750 Great Northern Rd
Sault Area Hospital
Hospitalist Program
3rd Floor
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-759-3434
Extension: 5352
Fax: 705-759-3731
Address: 650 Northern Avenue East
Extendicare Maple View
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 6G3
Phone: 705-574-3000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 443 Northern Avenue East
Algoma Nurse Practitioner-Led Clinic
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 4J3
Phone: 705-942-4717
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 240 McNabb St
Group Health Centre
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 1Y5
Phone: 705-759-1234
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 658 Second Line West
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6C 2K9
Phone: 7054505339
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 750 Great Northern Road
Sault Area Hospital
Emergency Department
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Phone: 705-207-9196
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jordan D.S. Law Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jul 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Law (CPSO#: 131188 )
Business Address: 750 Great Northern Rd
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 0A8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JORDAN DANIEL SCOTT LAW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAW is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JORDAN DANIEL SCOTT LAW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAW is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021