THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 04:40:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2021
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101 Progress Cres
Kapuskasing ON P5N 3H5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-371-2220
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 241 Eighth Street
Lady Minto Hospital
Cochrane Ontario P0L 1C0
Phone: (705) 272-7200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
HSN
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst) Hearst
Lady Minto Hospital Cochrane
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
HOSPITAL: Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst)
LOCATION: Hearst

HOSPITAL: Lady Minto Hospital
LOCATION: Cochrane

HOSPITAL: Sensenbrenner Hospital
LOCATION: Kapuskasing

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.P. PROULX MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Proulx (CPSO#: 131257 )
Business Address: 101 Progress Crescent
Kapuskasing Ontario P5N 3H5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101 Progress Cres
Kapuskasing ON P5N 3H5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-371-2220
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 241 Eighth Street
Lady Minto Hospital
Cochrane Ontario P0L 1C0
Phone: (705) 272-7200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
HSN
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst) Hearst
Lady Minto Hospital Cochrane
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
HOSPITAL: Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst)
LOCATION: Hearst

HOSPITAL: Lady Minto Hospital
LOCATION: Cochrane

HOSPITAL: Sensenbrenner Hospital
LOCATION: Kapuskasing

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.P. PROULX MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Proulx (CPSO#: 131257 )
Business Address: 101 Progress Crescent
Kapuskasing Ontario P5N 3H5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MIGUEAL PIERRE PROULX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PROULX is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MIGUEAL PIERRE PROULX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PROULX is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021