THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:49:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Yasuj University of Medical Sciences, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1700 King Road
improvedcare clinic
unit 12
King City Ontario L0G
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058338421
Fax: 9058332727

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jul 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 22 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. EMEL GHAFARI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ghafari (CPSO#: 131585 )
Business Address: unit 12-1700 King Road
King City Ontario L7B 0N1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN
Medical School: Yasuj University of Medical Sciences, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1700 King Road
improvedcare clinic
unit 12
King City Ontario L0G
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058338421
Fax: 9058332727

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jul 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 22 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. EMEL GHAFARI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ghafari (CPSO#: 131585 )
Business Address: unit 12-1700 King Road
King City Ontario L7B 0N1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMEL GHAFARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHAFARI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMEL GHAFARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHAFARI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Yasuj University of Medical Sciences, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021