THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 04:06:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2021
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 4K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5197423611
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst) Hearst
HOSPITAL: Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst)
LOCATION: Hearst

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jielin Lu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lu (CPSO#: 131652 )
Business Address: 561 Sprucewood Drive
London Ontario N5X 4J5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 4K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5197423611
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst) Hearst
HOSPITAL: Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst)
LOCATION: Hearst

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jielin Lu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lu (CPSO#: 131652 )
Business Address: 561 Sprucewood Drive
London Ontario N5X 4J5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JIELIN LU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JIELIN LU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021