THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:22:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201 - 215 Fanshawe Park Rd W
London ON N6G 5A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-645-2444
Extension: 3
Fax: 519-286-6806
Address: 2901 Eglinton Ave W
Unit C4
Mississauga ON L5M 6J3
Phone: 905-607-4747
Fax: 905-607-4066

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR.FADY ANDRAOUS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Andraous (CPSO#: 131689 )
Business Address: 201 - 215 Fanshawe Park Rd W
London ON N6G 5A9
519-645-2444 Extn: 3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201 - 215 Fanshawe Park Rd W
London ON N6G 5A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-645-2444
Extension: 3
Fax: 519-286-6806
Address: 2901 Eglinton Ave W
Unit C4
Mississauga ON L5M 6J3
Phone: 905-607-4747
Fax: 905-607-4066

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR.FADY ANDRAOUS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Andraous (CPSO#: 131689 )
Business Address: 201 - 215 Fanshawe Park Rd W
London ON N6G 5A9
519-645-2444 Extn: 3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FADY ANDRAOUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDRAOUS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FADY ANDRAOUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDRAOUS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 14 Sep 2026

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021