THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 10:35:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: Czart, Pamela (Used Until: 04 Sep 2023)
Medical School: McMaster University, 2021
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1201 Queen Street
Kincardine Ontario N2Z 3C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 396-6773
Fax: 1-866-305-9915

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jan 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 10 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Four Counties Health Services Newbury
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

HOSPITAL: Four Counties Health Services
LOCATION: Newbury

General Information

Former Name: Czart, Pamela (Used Until: 04 Sep 2023)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1201 Queen Street
Kincardine Ontario N2Z 3C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 396-6773
Fax: 1-866-305-9915

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jan 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 10 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Four Counties Health Services Newbury
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

HOSPITAL: Four Counties Health Services
LOCATION: Newbury

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAMELA GILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAMELA GILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021