THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 22:49:52 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2021
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1650 Elgin Mills Road East
Suite 302
Richmond Hill Ontario L4S 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 809-3131
Fax: (289) 809-3132
Address: 9390 Woodbine Avenue
Unit 1E3
Markham Ontario L6C 0M5
Phone: 905-766-4700
Fax: 647-670-0767

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michelle Liu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 May 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Liu (CPSO#: 131733 )
Business Address: 1650 Elgin Mills Road East
Suite 302
Richmond Hill Ontario L4S 0B2
(289) 809-3131

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1650 Elgin Mills Road East
Suite 302
Richmond Hill Ontario L4S 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 809-3131
Fax: (289) 809-3132
Address: 9390 Woodbine Avenue
Unit 1E3
Markham Ontario L6C 0M5
Phone: 905-766-4700
Fax: 647-670-0767

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michelle Liu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 May 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Liu (CPSO#: 131733 )
Business Address: 1650 Elgin Mills Road East
Suite 302
Richmond Hill Ontario L4S 0B2
(289) 809-3131

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHELLE LEI-NGA LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHELLE LEI-NGA LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021