THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:50:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1195 Hyde Park Road
Hydepark Walk-in Clinic
London Ontario N6H 5K6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-474-0996
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Trusty Care Walk-In Clinic
925 Dundas St
Woodstock ON N4S 8V3
Phone: (519) 537-2992
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR NORA MAMDOUH MOHAMED YASSIN GHALLAB MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ghallab (CPSO#: 131741 )
Business Address: 499 Sophia Crescent
London Ontario N6G 0X9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1195 Hyde Park Road
Hydepark Walk-in Clinic
London Ontario N6H 5K6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-474-0996
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Trusty Care Walk-In Clinic
925 Dundas St
Woodstock ON N4S 8V3
Phone: (519) 537-2992
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR NORA MAMDOUH MOHAMED YASSIN GHALLAB MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ghallab (CPSO#: 131741 )
Business Address: 499 Sophia Crescent
London Ontario N6G 0X9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NORA MAMDOUH MOHAMED YASSIN GHALLAB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHALLAB is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NORA MAMDOUH MOHAMED YASSIN GHALLAB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHALLAB is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 09 Nov 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Nov 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 01 Aug 2026

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021