THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:46:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2021
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 9999 Stn Main
Building P-144
Garrison Medical Clinic
CDU 2
Petawawa ON K8H 2X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-687-5511
Extension: 242-4197
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 705 Mackay St
Pembroke Regional Hospital
Emergency Department
Pembroke ON K8A 1G8
Phone: 613-732-2811
Extension: 6008
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Deep River and District Hospital Deep River
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Deep River and District Hospital
LOCATION: Deep River

HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DANIEL L. CARTER MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Carter (CPSO#: 131772 )
Business Address: PO Box 9999 Stn Main
Building P-144
Petawawa ON K8H 2X3
613-687-5511 Extn: 242-4197
Business Address: 705 Mackay St
Pembroke ON K8A 1G8
613-732-2811 Extn: 6008

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 9999 Stn Main
Building P-144
Garrison Medical Clinic
CDU 2
Petawawa ON K8H 2X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-687-5511
Extension: 242-4197
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 705 Mackay St
Pembroke Regional Hospital
Emergency Department
Pembroke ON K8A 1G8
Phone: 613-732-2811
Extension: 6008
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Deep River and District Hospital Deep River
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Deep River and District Hospital
LOCATION: Deep River

HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DANIEL L. CARTER MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Carter (CPSO#: 131772 )
Business Address: PO Box 9999 Stn Main
Building P-144
Petawawa ON K8H 2X3
613-687-5511 Extn: 242-4197
Business Address: 705 Mackay St
Pembroke ON K8A 1G8
613-732-2811 Extn: 6008

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL LYNDON CARTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARTER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL LYNDON CARTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARTER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021