THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:25:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2021
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Garrison Medical Clinic
PO Box 9999 Stn Main
Building P144 - CDU 2
Petawawa ON K8H 2X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 687-5511
Extension: 242-4214
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
33 Drummond St W
Perth ON K7H 2K1
Phone: (613) 267-1500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Courtney Guy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Feb 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Guy (CPSO#: 131825 )
Business Address: 6136875511 Extn: 242-4214

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Garrison Medical Clinic
PO Box 9999 Stn Main
Building P144 - CDU 2
Petawawa ON K8H 2X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 687-5511
Extension: 242-4214
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
33 Drummond St W
Perth ON K7H 2K1
Phone: (613) 267-1500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Courtney Guy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Feb 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Guy (CPSO#: 131825 )
Business Address: 6136875511 Extn: 242-4214

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. COURTNEY MORGAN GUY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. COURTNEY MORGAN GUY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021