THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:27:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2021
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 67 Somme Road
Petawawa Ontario K8H 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6136875511
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Deep River and District Hospital Deep River
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Deep River and District Hospital
LOCATION: Deep River

HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bark Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Bark (CPSO#: 131891 )
Business Address: 705 Mackay St
Pembroke ON K8A 1G8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 67 Somme Road
Petawawa Ontario K8H 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6136875511
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Deep River and District Hospital Deep River
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Deep River and District Hospital
LOCATION: Deep River

HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bark Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Bark (CPSO#: 131891 )
Business Address: 705 Mackay St
Pembroke ON K8A 1G8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRODO BARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRODO BARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021