THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:20:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2021
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 640 Grace Street
Southlake Residential Care Village
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 8V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-895-7661
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Credit Valley Hospital
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Hospital
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 9 Neilson Road
Seven Oaks Long-Term Care
City of Toronto
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B8
Phone: (416) 392-3500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3276 Saint Clair Avenue East
Providence Healthcare
Unity Health Toronto
Toronto Ontario M1L 1W1
Phone: (416) 285-3666
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fahad Qureshi Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Qureshi (CPSO#: 131950 )
Business Address: 640 Grace Street
Southlake Residential Care Village
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 8V7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 640 Grace Street
Southlake Residential Care Village
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 8V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-895-7661
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Credit Valley Hospital
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Hospital
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 9 Neilson Road
Seven Oaks Long-Term Care
City of Toronto
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B8
Phone: (416) 392-3500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3276 Saint Clair Avenue East
Providence Healthcare
Unity Health Toronto
Toronto Ontario M1L 1W1
Phone: (416) 285-3666
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fahad Qureshi Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Qureshi (CPSO#: 131950 )
Business Address: 640 Grace Street
Southlake Residential Care Village
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 8V7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FAHAD MANZAR QURESHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QURESHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FAHAD MANZAR QURESHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QURESHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021