THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:12:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2021
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1204 Roland Street
Northern Physiotherapy And Sports Injury Clinic
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 5M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807)-628-8855
Fax: (807)-270-0210

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Wainwright Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Wainwright (CPSO#: 132039 )
Business Address: 1204 Roland Street
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 5M5
1-807-628-8855

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1204 Roland Street
Northern Physiotherapy And Sports Injury Clinic
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 5M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807)-628-8855
Fax: (807)-270-0210

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Wainwright Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Wainwright (CPSO#: 132039 )
Business Address: 1204 Roland Street
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 5M5
1-807-628-8855

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW ROBERT LOUIS WAINWRIGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAINWRIGHT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW ROBERT LOUIS WAINWRIGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAINWRIGHT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021