THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 04:52:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2021
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1061 McNicoll Avenue
Main Floor
Toronto Ontario M1W 3W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6473551117
Fax: 6474800887

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Y. D. Diwan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Diwan (CPSO#: 132157 )
Business Address: 2537 Waterford St
Oakville ON L6L 5E5
6473909058

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1061 McNicoll Avenue
Main Floor
Toronto Ontario M1W 3W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6473551117
Fax: 6474800887

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Y. D. Diwan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Diwan (CPSO#: 132157 )
Business Address: 2537 Waterford St
Oakville ON L6L 5E5
6473909058

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YASH DHAR DIWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIWAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YASH DHAR DIWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIWAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021