THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:45:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2021
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 79 Fifth Ave PO Box 489
Hugh Allen Clinic
Sioux Lookout ON P8T 1L4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 737-3803
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout Meno Ya Win Health Centre
Sioux Lookout ON P8T 1B4
Phone: (807) 737-3030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. AUSTIN ELLIOTT MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Elliott (CPSO#: 132163 )
Business Address: 13 Government Row
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1E6
5198904783

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 79 Fifth Ave PO Box 489
Hugh Allen Clinic
Sioux Lookout ON P8T 1L4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 737-3803
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout Meno Ya Win Health Centre
Sioux Lookout ON P8T 1B4
Phone: (807) 737-3030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. AUSTIN ELLIOTT MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Elliott (CPSO#: 132163 )
Business Address: 13 Government Row
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1E6
5198904783

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AUSTIN JAMES ELLIOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELLIOTT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AUSTIN JAMES ELLIOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELLIOTT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jan 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 24 Aug 2026

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021