THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:12:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2021
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Fletcher Cres
Alliston ON L9R 1M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7054356281
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 451 Paxton Street
lakeridge health
emergency
1
Port Perry Ontario L9L 1L9
Phone: (905) 985-7321
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ross M. Book Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Book (CPSO#: 132204 )
Business Address: 413 Spadina Road
Toronto Ontario M5P 2W1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Fletcher Cres
Alliston ON L9R 1M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7054356281
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 451 Paxton Street
lakeridge health
emergency
1
Port Perry Ontario L9L 1L9
Phone: (905) 985-7321
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ross M. Book Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Book (CPSO#: 132204 )
Business Address: 413 Spadina Road
Toronto Ontario M5P 2W1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROSS MATTHEW BOOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOOK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROSS MATTHEW BOOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOOK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021