THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:29:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2021
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 451 Paxton St
Port Perry ON L9L 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N4
Phone: 19056233331
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MINAHZ HABIB MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Habib (CPSO#: 132287 )
Business Address: 451 Paxton Street
Port Perry Ontario L9L 1L9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 451 Paxton St
Port Perry ON L9L 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N4
Phone: 19056233331
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MINAHZ HABIB MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Habib (CPSO#: 132287 )
Business Address: 451 Paxton Street
Port Perry Ontario L9L 1L9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MINAHZ KIROLLOS HABIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HABIB is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MINAHZ KIROLLOS HABIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HABIB is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Aug 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 18 Aug 2026

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021