THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:17:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2021
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 596 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 28 Oct 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: EDWARD FENG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Feng (CPSO#: 132290 )
Business Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 596 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 28 Oct 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: EDWARD FENG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Feng (CPSO#: 132290 )
Business Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDWARD FENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FENG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDWARD FENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FENG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021