THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:07:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2021
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Civic Hospital
Emergency Department
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 494 2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 835 King Street West
Grand River Hospital
Kitchener Ontario N2G 4K9
Phone: 519 742 3611
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 28 Oct 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
William Osler Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V.S SETHURAMAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Sethuraman (CPSO#: 132331 )
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, TAMIL
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Civic Hospital
Emergency Department
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 494 2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 835 King Street West
Grand River Hospital
Kitchener Ontario N2G 4K9
Phone: 519 742 3611
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 28 Oct 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
William Osler Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V.S SETHURAMAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Sethuraman (CPSO#: 132331 )
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VIGNESH SHANKAR SETHURAMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SETHURAMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VIGNESH SHANKAR SETHURAMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SETHURAMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021