THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:22:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2021
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 737 Parkdale Ave
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Division of Dematology
4th floor
Ottawa ON K1Y 1J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Mar 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 11 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Meghan L. McPhie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. McPhie (CPSO#: 132338 )
Business Address: 737 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4M9
613-761-4689

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 737 Parkdale Ave
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Division of Dematology
4th floor
Ottawa ON K1Y 1J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Mar 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 11 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Meghan L. McPhie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. McPhie (CPSO#: 132338 )
Business Address: 737 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4M9
613-761-4689

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEGHAN LAUREN MCPHIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCPHIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEGHAN LAUREN MCPHIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCPHIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Mar 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021