THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:09:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2021
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 825 Coxwell Avenue
Michael Garron Hospital
Emergency Department
Toronto Ontario M4J 5C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 461-8272
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 30 The Queensway
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Emergency Department
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 28 Oct 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sara Brade Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Brade (CPSO#: 132343 )
Business Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue
Michael Garron Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Toronto Ontario M4J 5C2
(416) 461-8272
Business Address: 30 The Queensway
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 825 Coxwell Avenue
Michael Garron Hospital
Emergency Department
Toronto Ontario M4J 5C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 461-8272
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 30 The Queensway
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Emergency Department
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 28 Oct 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sara Brade Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Brade (CPSO#: 132343 )
Business Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue
Michael Garron Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Toronto Ontario M4J 5C2
(416) 461-8272
Business Address: 30 The Queensway
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARA JESSICA BRADE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRADE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARA JESSICA BRADE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRADE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021