THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 02:45:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2021
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 807 Broadview Ave
Albany Medical Clinic
Toronto ON M4K 2P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 461-9471
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3555 Danforth Ave
Chester Village
Scarborough ON M1L 1E3
Phone: (416) 466-2173
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elliott McMurchy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. E. McMurchy (CPSO#: 132389 )
Business Address: 807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 2P8
Business Address: 3555 Danforth Avenue
Chester Village
Toronto Ontario M1L 1E3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 807 Broadview Ave
Albany Medical Clinic
Toronto ON M4K 2P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 461-9471
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3555 Danforth Ave
Chester Village
Scarborough ON M1L 1E3
Phone: (416) 466-2173
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elliott McMurchy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. E. McMurchy (CPSO#: 132389 )
Business Address: 807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 2P8
Business Address: 3555 Danforth Avenue
Chester Village
Toronto Ontario M1L 1E3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELLIOTT MONTE MCMURCHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCMURCHY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELLIOTT MONTE MCMURCHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCMURCHY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021