THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:04:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2021
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 19 Hospital Drive
Weeneebayko General Hospital
Moose Factory Ontario P0L 1W0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-658-4544
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MZY HUANG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Huang (CPSO#: 132637 )
Business Address: 19 Hospital Drive
Moose Factory Ontario P0L 1W0
(705) 658-1111

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 19 Hospital Drive
Weeneebayko General Hospital
Moose Factory Ontario P0L 1W0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-658-4544
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MZY HUANG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Huang (CPSO#: 132637 )
Business Address: 19 Hospital Drive
Moose Factory Ontario P0L 1W0
(705) 658-1111

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL ZI YUE HUANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL ZI YUE HUANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021