THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:02:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University College Cork School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Street
Ardleigh Surgery
Ardleigh England CO7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +447432414813
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jan 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 06 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.O'Carroll Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. O'Carroll (CPSO#: 132638 )
Business Address: 16 North Carolina Avenue
Wasaga Beach Ontario L9Z 3A8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University College Cork School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Street
Ardleigh Surgery
Ardleigh England CO7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +447432414813
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jan 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 06 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.O'Carroll Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. O'Carroll (CPSO#: 132638 )
Business Address: 16 North Carolina Avenue
Wasaga Beach Ontario L9Z 3A8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHELLE O'CARROLL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'CARROLL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHELLE O'CARROLL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'CARROLL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University College Cork School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2022
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Feb 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 14 Dec 2025