THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:20:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Icahn School of Medicine at Mount Sinai, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University Health Network
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-946-2059
Fax: 416-946- 4563
Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 10 Feb 2025
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 Oct 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 10 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 08 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: LANCMAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Oct 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Lancman (CPSO#: 132651 )
Business Address: 51 Ellingwood Crt
Markham ON L3R 8A7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Icahn School of Medicine at Mount Sinai, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University Health Network
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-946-2059
Fax: 416-946- 4563
Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 10 Feb 2025
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 Oct 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 10 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 08 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: LANCMAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Oct 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Lancman (CPSO#: 132651 )
Business Address: 51 Ellingwood Crt
Markham ON L3R 8A7

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
25 May 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 25 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. GUIDO SEBASTIAN LANCMAN may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and hematology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. GUIDO SEBASTIAN LANCMAN may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and hematology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Icahn School of Medicine at Mount Sinai, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 May 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 May 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Oct 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 08 Oct 2022