THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:45:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2021
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 667-6538
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 339 Windermere Road
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
Division of Emergency Medicine
London Ontario N6G 2M3
Phone: 5196858500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 267 Grosvenor Street
St. Joseph's Health Care
Division of Emergency Medicine
London Ontario N6A 3S7
Phone: (519) 667-6538
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 28 Oct 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
HOSPITAL: St Mary's Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: St Marys

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Neil K. Sengupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sengupta (CPSO#: 132782 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 667-6538
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 339 Windermere Road
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
Division of Emergency Medicine
London Ontario N6G 2M3
Phone: 5196858500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 267 Grosvenor Street
St. Joseph's Health Care
Division of Emergency Medicine
London Ontario N6A 3S7
Phone: (519) 667-6538
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 28 Oct 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
HOSPITAL: St Mary's Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: St Marys

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Neil K. Sengupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sengupta (CPSO#: 132782 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEIL KUMAR SENGUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SENGUPTA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEIL KUMAR SENGUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SENGUPTA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021