THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:25:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2021
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3-4130 Glenview Rd
Petrolia ON N0N 1R0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 882-2500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 450 Blanche St
Petrolia ON N0N 1R0
Phone: (519) 882-4325
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 270 Queen St W
St Mary's Memorial Hospital
St. Marys ON N4X 1C8
Phone: (519) 284-1332
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 310 Juliana Dr
Woodstock ON N4V 0A4
Phone: (519) 421-4211
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3-4130 Glenview Rd
Petrolia ON N0N 1R0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 882-2500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 450 Blanche St
Petrolia ON N0N 1R0
Phone: (519) 882-4325
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 270 Queen St W
St Mary's Memorial Hospital
St. Marys ON N4X 1C8
Phone: (519) 284-1332
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 310 Juliana Dr
Woodstock ON N4V 0A4
Phone: (519) 421-4211
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WESLEY WAYNE TIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WESLEY WAYNE TIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Dec 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 17 Oct 2026

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021