THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:46:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ben-Gurion University of the Negev Faculty of Health Sciences, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4001 Leslie Street
North York General Hospital
Internal Medicine
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167566577
Fax: 4167566567
Address: 1600 Steeles Avenue West
Vaughan Ontario L4K 4M2
Phone: 6473136116
Fax: 6473133001

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 22 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 07 Jul 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 22 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ben-Gurion University of the Negev Faculty of Health Sciences, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4001 Leslie Street
North York General Hospital
Internal Medicine
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167566577
Fax: 4167566567
Address: 1600 Steeles Avenue West
Vaughan Ontario L4K 4M2
Phone: 6473136116
Fax: 6473133001

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 22 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 07 Jul 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 22 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT CHRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHRIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT CHRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHRIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ben-Gurion University of the Negev Faculty of Health Sciences, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2021