THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:06:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3580 Thomas St
Intrepid Clinic
Mississauga ON L5M 2S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054121008
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 6005 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga Ontario L5N 0G5
Phone: 2894543021
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3869 Jane Street
Toronto Ontario M3N 2K1
Phone: 6477761990
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abou El Yazid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Abou El Yazid (CPSO#: 133022 )
Business Address: 3580 Thomas Street
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2S6
9054121008

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3580 Thomas St
Intrepid Clinic
Mississauga ON L5M 2S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054121008
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 6005 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga Ontario L5N 0G5
Phone: 2894543021
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3869 Jane Street
Toronto Ontario M3N 2K1
Phone: 6477761990
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abou El Yazid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Abou El Yazid (CPSO#: 133022 )
Business Address: 3580 Thomas Street
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2S6
9054121008

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HANAN ABDEL ATY MAHMOUD ABOU EL YAZID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABOU EL YAZID is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HANAN ABDEL ATY MAHMOUD ABOU EL YAZID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABOU EL YAZID is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2022
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2022