THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 07:06:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137464621
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 722-7000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 116 Albert Street
ExecHealth
Suite 401
Ottawa Ontario K1P 5G3
Phone: (613) 216-3932
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: TRACZYK & EYDT MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jan 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Eydt (CPSO#: 133157 ) Dr. L. Traczyk (CPSO#: 135801 )
Business Address: 713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
613-749-4429

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137464621
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 722-7000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 116 Albert Street
ExecHealth
Suite 401
Ottawa Ontario K1P 5G3
Phone: (613) 216-3932
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: TRACZYK & EYDT MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jan 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Eydt (CPSO#: 133157 ) Dr. L. Traczyk (CPSO#: 135801 )
Business Address: 713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
613-749-4429

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GABRIEL DAVID EYDT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EYDT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GABRIEL DAVID EYDT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EYDT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2021
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Oct 2021