THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:09:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 301 James Street South
Hamilton Ontario L8P 3B6
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 905-522-1155
Extension: 32214
Fax: 905-383-3336

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: PIDUTTI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Pidutti (CPSO#: 133158 )
Business Address: 258 Squire Crescent
Oakville Ontario L6H 7C3
6475229264
Business Address: 301 James Street South
Hamilton Ontario L8P 3B6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 301 James Street South
Hamilton Ontario L8P 3B6
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 905-522-1155
Extension: 32214
Fax: 905-383-3336

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: PIDUTTI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Pidutti (CPSO#: 133158 )
Business Address: 258 Squire Crescent
Oakville Ontario L6H 7C3
6475229264
Business Address: 301 James Street South
Hamilton Ontario L8P 3B6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOEL ANDREW PIDUTTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIDUTTI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOEL ANDREW PIDUTTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIDUTTI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Sep 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2021