THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:10:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, NORWEGIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101-860 Tecumseh Rd E
Windsor ON N8X 2S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Feb 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 16 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H.Heggum Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jan 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Heggum (CPSO#: 133172 )
Business Address: 860 Tecumseh Rd E
Windsor ON N8X 2S5
5192557118

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, NORWEGIAN
Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101-860 Tecumseh Rd E
Windsor ON N8X 2S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Feb 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 16 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H.Heggum Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jan 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Heggum (CPSO#: 133172 )
Business Address: 860 Tecumseh Rd E
Windsor ON N8X 2S5
5192557118

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEGE FINVOLD HEGGUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEGGUM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEGE FINVOLD HEGGUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEGGUM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Mar 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2021