THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 07:52:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dubai Medical College for Girls, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart Street
Kingston Health Sciences Center
Department of Medicine
Inpatients Unit
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (618) 543 3232
Fax: (613) 533-6654

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Apr 2025
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 01 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Arab Emirates

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rommana Mehdi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mehdi (CPSO#: 133292 )
Business Address:

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dubai Medical College for Girls, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart Street
Kingston Health Sciences Center
Department of Medicine
Inpatients Unit
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (618) 543 3232
Fax: (613) 533-6654

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Apr 2025
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 01 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Arab Emirates

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rommana Mehdi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mehdi (CPSO#: 133292 )
Business Address:

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Apr 2025
30 Jun 2028
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 01 2025
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2028
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. ROMMANA MEHDI may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of General Internal Medicine, Queen’s University, in which Dr. MEHDI holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of their academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. MEHDI no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. MEHDI’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. MEHDI’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 April, 2025, and expires on 30 June, 2028. Upon renewal of Dr. MEHDI's academic appointment at Queen's University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. ROMMANA MEHDI may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of General Internal Medicine, Queen’s University, in which Dr. MEHDI holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of their academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. MEHDI no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. MEHDI’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. MEHDI’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 April, 2025, and expires on 30 June, 2028. Upon renewal of Dr. MEHDI's academic appointment at Queen's University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dubai Medical College for Girls, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2025
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Aug 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2025
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2025
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2028

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022