THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:54:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Shiraz University, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-87 Sheppard Ave W
North York ON M2N 1M4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 478 6800
Fax: (647) 777 6147
Address: 9580 Yonge Street
Viva Health Centre
unit 6
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 1V6
Phone: 9052378482
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Masoudi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Masoudi (CPSO#: 133308 )

Corporation Name: Dr.'s Javan Bakht, Masoudi, and Vahidtari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Jan 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN
Medical School: Shiraz University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-87 Sheppard Ave W
North York ON M2N 1M4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 478 6800
Fax: (647) 777 6147
Address: 9580 Yonge Street
Viva Health Centre
unit 6
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 1V6
Phone: 9052378482
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Masoudi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Masoudi (CPSO#: 133308 )

Corporation Name: Dr.'s Javan Bakht, Masoudi, and Vahidtari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Jan 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PARHAM MASOUDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASOUDI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PARHAM MASOUDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASOUDI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Shiraz University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2021
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2021