THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:46:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2020
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kenora Medical Associates
1-45 Wolsley St
Kenora ON P9N 3W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
21 Sylvan St
Kenora ON P9N 3W7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adam Krahn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Krahn (CPSO#: 133360 )
Business Address: 45 Wolsley Street
Unit 1
Postal Code: P9N 3W7
Kenora Ontario P0V
1-807-468-3021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kenora Medical Associates
1-45 Wolsley St
Kenora ON P9N 3W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
21 Sylvan St
Kenora ON P9N 3W7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adam Krahn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Krahn (CPSO#: 133360 )
Business Address: 45 Wolsley Street
Unit 1
Postal Code: P9N 3W7
Kenora Ontario P0V
1-807-468-3021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADAM EVAN ISAAC KRAHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRAHN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADAM EVAN ISAAC KRAHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRAHN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Jan 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jan 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 29 Aug 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2021