THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:36:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sohag University Faculty of Medicine, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
Room C753
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416.480.4037
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Oct 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Dec 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 08 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 12 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moheb Basta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Basta (CPSO#: 133442 )
Business Address: 100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Sohag University Faculty of Medicine, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
Room C753
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416.480.4037
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Oct 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Dec 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 08 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 12 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moheb Basta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Basta (CPSO#: 133442 )
Business Address: 100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHEB SAMIR SAMY BASTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASTA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHEB SAMIR SAMY BASTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASTA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sohag University Faculty of Medicine, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2021
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2021