THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:02:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Zanjan University of Medical Sciences, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4773 Yonge St
North York ON M2N 0G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6474787879
Fax: 6476893726

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: vahidtari medicine professional corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Vahidtari (CPSO#: 133515 )
Business Address: 6023 Yonge St
North York ON M2M 3W2
(416) 916-2733
Business Address: 4D-4773 Yonge St
Elegance Medical Clinic
North York ON M2N 0G2
6474787879

Corporation Name: Dr.'s Javan Bakht, Masoudi, and Vahidtari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Jan 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Zanjan University of Medical Sciences, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4773 Yonge St
North York ON M2N 0G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6474787879
Fax: 6476893726

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: vahidtari medicine professional corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Vahidtari (CPSO#: 133515 )
Business Address: 6023 Yonge St
North York ON M2M 3W2
(416) 916-2733
Business Address: 4D-4773 Yonge St
Elegance Medical Clinic
North York ON M2N 0G2
6474787879

Corporation Name: Dr.'s Javan Bakht, Masoudi, and Vahidtari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Jan 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEYEDHOSSEIN VAHIDTARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAHIDTARI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEYEDHOSSEIN VAHIDTARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAHIDTARI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Zanjan University of Medical Sciences, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2021
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2021