THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:10:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Benin, 2005
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 303-180 Vine St S
St. Catharines ON L2R 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289 362 5524
Fax: 905 937 8446

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador
Nigeria
Trinidad and Tobago

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. OMESIRI GORLEH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Gorleh (CPSO#: 133519 )
Business Address: 302-180 Vine St S
St Catharines ON L2R 7P3
2893625524

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Benin, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 303-180 Vine St S
St. Catharines ON L2R 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289 362 5524
Fax: 905 937 8446

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador
Nigeria
Trinidad and Tobago

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. OMESIRI GORLEH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Gorleh (CPSO#: 133519 )
Business Address: 302-180 Vine St S
St Catharines ON L2R 7P3
2893625524

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OMESIRI GORLEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GORLEH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OMESIRI GORLEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GORLEH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Benin, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2021
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2021