THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:13:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: Iloabachie, Ogugua (Used Until: 09 Jul 2021)
Medical School: Medical University of Warsaw, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 537 Frederick St
Kitchener ON N2B 2A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-804-4190
Fax: 519-340-6819

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jan 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 13 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Vann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Vann (CPSO#: 133590 )
Business Address: 23-500 Fairway Rd S
Kitchener ON N2C 1X3

General Information

Former Name: Iloabachie, Ogugua (Used Until: 09 Jul 2021)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: Medical University of Warsaw, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 537 Frederick St
Kitchener ON N2B 2A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-804-4190
Fax: 519-340-6819

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jan 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 13 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Vann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Vann (CPSO#: 133590 )
Business Address: 23-500 Fairway Rd S
Kitchener ON N2C 1X3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OGUGUA OGECHINYELU VANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OGUGUA OGECHINYELU VANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of Warsaw, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2022
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 2022