THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:34:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: McAlpine, David John (Used Until: 21 Jul 2024)
Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.J. Mc Alpine Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Mc Alpine (CPSO#: 133747 )
Business Address: 600 University Avenue
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
4165964200

General Information

Former Name: McAlpine, David John (Used Until: 21 Jul 2024)
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.J. Mc Alpine Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Mc Alpine (CPSO#: 133747 )
Business Address: 600 University Avenue
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
4165964200

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID JOHN MC ALPINE may practise medicine only to the extent required by the appointment at Mount Sinai Hospital for which the certificate is issued to Dr. MC ALPINE;
(2) Dr. MC ALPINE may practise medicine only under the supervision of the member of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario who has given an undertaking to supervise Dr. MC ALPINE and be responsible for providing continuing care for the patients attended by Dr. MC ALPINE;
(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following days:
(i) The day of expiry of the appointment referred to in clause (1),
(ii) The day Dr. MC ALPINE leaves Ontario, or
(iii) The thirtieth day after the certificate is issued.
NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is 14 May, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID JOHN MC ALPINE may practise medicine only to the extent required by the appointment at Mount Sinai Hospital for which the certificate is issued to Dr. MC ALPINE;
(2) Dr. MC ALPINE may practise medicine only under the supervision of the member of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario who has given an undertaking to supervise Dr. MC ALPINE and be responsible for providing continuing care for the patients attended by Dr. MC ALPINE;
(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following days:
(i) The day of expiry of the appointment referred to in clause (1),
(ii) The day Dr. MC ALPINE leaves Ontario, or
(iii) The thirtieth day after the certificate is issued.
NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is 14 May, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2025
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 06 Apr 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2025
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jan 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2022
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Apr 2025
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 14 May 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2022